Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lawrence Mukkuzhy

Bishop of Belthangady (Syro-Malabar)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Aug 1951 BornSullia
27 Dec 197827.3Ordained PriestPriest
24 Apr 199947.6AppointedBishop of Belthangady (Syro-Malabar), India
4 Aug 199947.9Ordained BishopBishop of Belthangady (Syro-Malabar), India

MicroData Summary for Lawrence Mukkuzhy:
Bishop Lawrence Mukkuzhy (born ) Bishop of Belthangady

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Belthangady (Syro-Malabar).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 156, Number 13,593
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015