Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sebastian Valloppilly

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tellicherry (Syro-Malabar), India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Aug 1911Born
24 Aug 194534.0Ordained PriestPriest of Changanacherry (Syro-Malabar), India
16 Oct 195544.1AppointedBishop of Tellicherry (Syro-Malabar), India
8 Jan 195644.4Ordained BishopBishop of Tellicherry (Syro-Malabar), India
18 Feb 198977.5RetiredBishop of Tellicherry (Syro-Malabar), India
4 Apr 200694.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Tellicherry (Syro-Malabar), India

MicroData Summary for Sebastian Valloppilly
Bishop Sebastian Valloppilly (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tellicherry

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKudakkachira

  • a priest for 60.6 years
  • a bishop for 50.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1956, Number 4
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)
  • opd: CB, 5 Nov 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast