Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop George Njaralakatt

Archbishop of Tellicherry (Syro-Malabar), India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jun 1946 Born
20 Dec 197125.4Ordained PriestPriest of Tellicherry (Syro-Malabar), India
1 Mar 197326.6IncardinatedPriest of Mananthavady (Syro-Malabar), India
27 Aug 200761.1IncardinatedPriest of Bhadravathi (Syro-Malabar), India
18 Jan 201063.5AppointedBishop of Mandya (Syro-Malabar), India
7 Apr 201063.7Ordained BishopBishop of Mandya (Syro-Malabar), India
29 Aug 201468.1AppointedArchbishop of Tellicherry (Syro-Malabar), India

MicroData Summary for George Njaralakatt
Archbishop George Njaralakatt (born ) Archbishop of Tellicherry

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKalayanthany
Ordained PriestSt. Joseph's, Cathedral, Tellicherry, Eparchy of Tellicherry (Syro-Malabar)
Ordained BishopInfant Jesus, Church, Hinkal

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archeparchy of Tellicherry (Syro-Malabar).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Jan 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 202, Number 16,615
  • ab: Bollettino, 29 Aug 2014
  • c1: CB, 5 Nov 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast