Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Irimpen

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Palghat (Syro-Malabarese)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Feb 1919BornPoovathussery
6 May 195031.2Ordained PriestPriest
27 Jun 197455.3AppointedBishop of Palghat (Syro-Malabarese), India
8 Sep 197455.5Ordained BishopBishop of Palghat (Syro-Malabarese), India
1 Dec 199475.8RetiredBishop of Palghat (Syro-Malabarese), India
23 Aug 199778.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Palghat (Syro-Malabarese), India

MicroData Summary for Joseph Irimpen:
Bishop Joseph Irimpen (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Palghat

  • a priest for 47.3 years
  • a bishop for 23.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013