Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Remigius Maria Paul Inchananiyil

Bishop of Thamarasserry (Syro-Malabarese)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jul 1961 BornVettilappara
12 Dec 198726.4Ordained PriestPriest of Thamarasserry (Syro-Malabarese), India
15 Jan 201048.5AppointedBishop of Thamarasserry (Syro-Malabarese), India
8 Apr 201048.7Ordained BishopBishop of Thamarasserry (Syro-Malabarese), India

MicroData Summary for Remigius Maria Paul Inchananiyil:
Bishop Remigius Maria Paul Inchananiyil (born ) Bishop of Thamarasserry

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Thamarasserry (Syro-Malabarese).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Jan 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 202, Number 16,616

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013