Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Erumachadath, M.C.B.S.

Bishop of Bhadravathi (Syro-Malabarese)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Apr 1960 BornUppukandam
17 May 198121.1ProfessedMember of Missionary Congregation of the Blessed Sacrament
7 May 198828.1Ordained PriestPriest of Missionary Congregation of the Blessed Sacrament
29 Aug 200747.4AppointedBishop of Bhadravathi (Syro-Malabarese), India
25 Oct 200747.5Ordained BishopBishop of Bhadravathi (Syro-Malabarese), India

MicroData Summary for Joseph Erumachadath:
Bishop Joseph Erumachadath M.C.B.S. (born ) Bishop of Bhadravathi

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Bhadravathi (Syro-Malabarese).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 29 Aug 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Number 15,557
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013