Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincent Samuel

Bishop of Neyyattinkara, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Aug 1950 Born
19 Dec 197525.3Ordained PriestPriest of Trivandrum, India
14 Jun 199645.8AppointedBishop of Neyyattinkara, India
1 Nov 199646.2Ordained BishopBishop of Neyyattinkara, India

MicroData Summary for Vincent Samuel
Bishop Vincent Samuel (born ) Bishop of Neyyattinkara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAyroor

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Neyyattinkara.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Number 12,908

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018