Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Christudas Rajappan

Auxiliary Bishop of Trivandrum

Titular Bishop of Avitta Bibba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Nov 1971 BornAdimalathura
25 Nov 199827.0Ordained PriestPriest of Trivandrum, India
2 Feb 201644.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Trivandrum, India
2 Feb 201644.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Avitta Bibba
3 Apr 201644.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Avitta Bibba

MicroData Summary for Christudas Rajappan
Bishop Christudas Rajappan (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Trivandrum

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Trivandrum.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2016
  • ob: CB, 2 Mar 2016
  • c2+: CB, 29 Mar 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 228, Number 18,888

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 20 Dec 2016