Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Raphael Anaparambil

Bishop of Alleppey, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Mar 1962 Born
17 Dec 198624.7Ordained PriestPriest of Alleppey, India
7 Dec 201755.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Alleppey, India
11 Feb 201855.9Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Alleppey, India
11 Oct 201957.5SucceededBishop of Alleppey, India

MicroData Summary for James Raphael Anaparambil (VIAF: 163231355)
Bishop James Raphael Anaparambil (born ) Bishop of Alleppey

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKandakadavu, Diocese of Alleppey
Ordained BishopSaint Andrew's, Basilica, Arthunkal, Diocese of Alleppey

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Alleppey.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Dec 2017
  • ob: CB, 2 Jan 2018
  • ob.loc: CB, 4 Feb 2018
  • c2+: CB, 10 Feb 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 235, Number 19,674
  • s: Bollettino, 11 Oct 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.5, 5 Oct 2019; Data: 11 Oct 2019

Quantcast