Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Michael Chenaparampil

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Alleppey


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1929BornManakodam
1 Jun 195626.4Ordained PriestPriest of Alleppey, India
19 Nov 198252.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Alleppey, India
4 Sep 198353.7Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Alleppey, India
28 Apr 198454.3SucceededBishop of Alleppey, India
9 Dec 200172.0ResignedBishop of Alleppey, India
18 Apr 201383.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Alleppey, India

MicroData Summary for Peter Michael Chenaparampil:
Bishop Peter Michael Chenaparampil (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Alleppey

  • a priest for 56.8 years
  • a bishop for 29.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 18 Apr 2013
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015