Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mathias Kappil

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Punalur, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jan 1928Born
7 Dec 195426.8Ordained PriestPriest
21 Dec 198557.9AppointedBishop of Punalur, India
13 Apr 198658.2Ordained BishopBishop of Punalur, India
12 Mar 200577.1RetiredBishop of Punalur, India
24 Feb 200779.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Punalur, India

MicroData Summary for Mathias Kappil
Bishop Mathias Kappil (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Punalur

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKallada

  • a priest for 52.2 years
  • a bishop for 20.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018