Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Maxwell Valentine Noronha

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Calicut, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Feb 1926Born
24 Aug 195226.5Ordained PriestPriest
7 Jun 198054.3AppointedBishop of Calicut, India
7 Sep 198054.5Ordained BishopBishop of Calicut, India
19 Apr 200276.1RetiredBishop of Calicut, India
28 Jan 201891.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Calicut, India

MicroData Summary for Maxwell Valentine Noronha
Bishop Maxwell Valentine Noronha (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Calicut

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKayamkulam
Death Place Kozhikode, Diocese of Calicut

  • a priest for 65.4 years
  • a bishop for 37.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 28 Jan 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast