Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aldo Maria Patroni, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Calicut


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Sep 1904BornSernio
21 Nov 193430.2Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
8 Apr 194843.5AppointedBishop of Calicut, India
27 Jun 194843.8Ordained BishopBishop of Calicut, India
7 Jun 198075.7RetiredBishop of Calicut, India
22 Sep 198884.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Calicut, India

MicroData Summary for Aldo Maria Patroni:
Bishop Aldo Maria Patroni S.J. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Calicut

  • a priest for 53.8 years
  • a bishop for 40.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 68

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013