Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Basil Salvador Theodore Peres

Deceased

Bishop of Mangalore, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Nov 1900Born
3 Dec 192929.0Ordained PriestPriest of Mangalore, India
3 Jul 195251.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Mangalore, India
3 Jul 195251.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Gisipa
28 Oct 195251.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gisipa
4 Jan 195554.1SucceededBishop of Mangalore, India
24 Apr 195857.4DiedBishop of Mangalore, India

MicroData Summary for Basil Salvador Theodore Peres
Bishop Basil Salvador Theodore Peres (born , died ) Bishop of Mangalore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMangalore, Diocese of Mangalore
Ordained BishopMangalore, Diocese of Mangalore

  • a priest for 28.3 years
  • a bishop for 5.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1958
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1952, Number 103
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 63, Number 4,897

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast