Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Varghese Chakkalakal

Bishop of Calicut


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Feb 1953 BornMalapallipuram
2 Apr 198128.1Ordained PriestPriest of Calicut, India
5 Nov 199845.7AppointedBishop of Kannur, India
7 Feb 199946.0Ordained BishopBishop of Kannur, India
15 May 201259.2AppointedBishop of Calicut, India
15 May 201259.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Kannur, India
23 Mar 201461.1CeasedApostolic Administrator of Kannur, India

MicroData Summary for Varghese Chakkalakal
Bishop Varghese Chakkalakal (born ) Bishop of Calicut

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Calicut.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Number 13,472
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 May 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 2 May 2016