Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ephrem-Edouard-Lucien-Théoponte Garrelon, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Mangalore

Titular Bishop of Nemesi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Nov 1827BornCasteljaloux, France
17 May 185527.5ProfessedMember of Order of Discalced Carmelites
24 Jul 186840.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Quilon, India
24 Jul 186840.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Nemesi
8 Nov 186841.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nemesi
3 Jun 187042.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Mangalore, India
10 Apr 1873³45.4DiedVicar Apostolic of Mangalore, India

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ephrem-Edouard-Lucien-Théoponte Garrelon:
Bishop Ephrem-Edouard-Lucien-Théoponte Garrelon O.C.D. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Mangalore

  • a bishop for 4.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 406

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013