Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Théophane Matthew Thannickunnel, O. Praem. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Jabalpur


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Sep 1928BornPlassanal
15 Aug 195930.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Canons Regular of Premontre; Norbertines
1 Mar 197647.4AppointedBishop of Jabalpur, India
31 Mar 197748.5Ordained BishopBishop of Jabalpur, India
16 May 200172.6RetiredBishop of Jabalpur, India
18 Nov 201688.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Jabalpur, India

MicroData Summary for Théophane Matthew Thannickunnel
Bishop Théophane Matthew Thannickunnel O. Praem. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Jabalpur

  • a priest for 57.2 years
  • a bishop for 39.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 19 Nov 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 19 Nov 2016