Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerald Almeida

Bishop of Jabalpur


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Mar 1946 BornUdyavar
14 Dec 197428.8Ordained PriestPriest
20 May 199751.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Jabalpur, India
17 Sep 199751.5Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Jabalpur, India
16 May 200155.2SucceededBishop of Jabalpur, India

MicroData Summary for Gerald Almeida:
Bishop Gerald Almeida (born ) Bishop of Jabalpur

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Jabalpur.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,144

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013