Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Etienne-Marie Bonaventure, M.S.F.S. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nagpur, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Apr 1851Born
26 May 187726.0Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of St. Francis de Sales d’Annecy
17 Sep 190453.3AppointedBishop of Nagpur, India
5 Feb 190553.7Ordained BishopBishop of Nagpur, India
12 Mar 190755.8DiedBishop of Nagpur, India

MicroData Summary for Etienne-Marie Bonaventure
Bishop Etienne-Marie Bonaventure M.S.F.S. (born , died ) Bishop of Nagpur

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDingy-Saint-Clair, France

  • a priest for 29.7 years
  • a bishop for 2.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1905, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast