Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Petronio Francesco Gramigna, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of Allahabad, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1844Born
13 Nov 186419.9Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
8 Dec 186823.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
10 Aug 190459.6AppointedBishop of Allahabad, India
18 Oct 190459.8Ordained BishopBishop of Allahabad, India
18 Dec 191773.0DiedBishop of Allahabad, India

MicroData Summary for Petronio Francesco Gramigna
Bishop Petronio Francesco Gramigna O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop of Allahabad

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastel Bolognese, Italy

  • a priest for 49.0 years
  • a bishop for 13.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 47
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1904, Number 53

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018