Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardine Thomas Edward Clark, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of Port Victoria o Seychelles


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Nov 1856BornLondon, Great Britain
1881¹24.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
21 Mar 190245.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Arabia, Yemen
21 Mar 190245.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Tingis
1 Jun 190245.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tingis
10 Jun 191053.6AppointedBishop of Port Victoria o Seychelles
26 Sep 191558.9DiedBishop of Port Victoria o Seychelles

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernardine Thomas Edward Clark:
Bishop Bernardine Thomas Edward Clark O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop of Port Victoria o Seychelles

  • a priest for 34.7 years
  • a bishop for 13.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 554
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1902, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013