Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-Callixte Lasserre, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Arabia

Titular Bishop of Marocco o Marruecos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Apr 1839BornVézeronce, France
15 Mar 188141.9AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Galla, Ethiopia
15 Mar 188141.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Marocco o Marruecos, Titular Sees
10 Dec 188243.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Marocco o Marruecos, Titular Sees
188646.7AppointedPrefect of Aden, Yemen
25 Apr 188849.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Aden, Yemen
8 May 188849.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Arabia, Yemen
Apr 190061.0ResignedVicar Apostolic of Arabia, Yemen
22 Aug 190364.4DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Arabia, Yemen

MicroData Summary for Louis-Callixte Lasserre:
Bishop Louis-Callixte Lasserre O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Arabia

  • a bishop for 20.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 368

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013