Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles Soreng, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Hazaribag, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Aug 1934Born
24 Mar 196934.5Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
23 Oct 198955.1AppointedBishop of Daltonganj, India
9 Feb 199055.4Ordained BishopBishop of Daltonganj, India
1 Apr 199560.6AppointedBishop of Hazaribag, India
8 Sep 201278.0RetiredBishop of Hazaribag, India
11 Jan 201984.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Hazaribag, India

MicroData Summary for Charles Soreng
Bishop Charles Soreng S.J. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Hazaribag

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChirratoli
Ordained BishopMahuadang
Death PlaceRanchi, Archdiocese of Ranchi

  • a priest for 49.7 years
  • a bishop for 28.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125, Number 11,280
  • r: Bollettino, 8 Sep 2012
  • d: CB, 11 Jan 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 12 Jan 2019

Quantcast