Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Felix Toppo, S.J.

Archbishop of Ranchi, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Nov 1947 Born
14 Apr 198234.3Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
14 Jun 199749.5AppointedBishop of Jamshedpur, India
27 Sep 199749.8Ordained BishopBishop of Jamshedpur, India
24 Jun 201870.5AppointedArchbishop of Ranchi, India
6 Aug 201870.7InstalledArchbishop of Ranchi, India

MicroData Summary for Felix Toppo
Archbishop Felix Toppo S.J. (born ) Archbishop of Ranchi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTongo
Ordained BishopOpen Air, Loyola School, Jamshedpur, Diocese of Jamshedpur

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Ranchi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,151
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 Jun 2018
  • i: CB, 7 Aug 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 7 Aug 2018

Quantcast