Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anand Jojo

Bishop of Hazaribag, India

Apostolic Administrator of Daltonganj


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 May 1959 Born
24 Apr 199232.9Ordained PriestPriest of Ranchi, India
28 May 199334.0IncardinatedPriest of Simdega, India
8 Sep 201253.3AppointedBishop of Hazaribag, India
8 Dec 201253.5Ordained BishopBishop of Hazaribag, India
7 Jul 201657.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Daltonganj, India

MicroData Summary for Anand Jojo
Bishop Anand Jojo (born ) Bishop of Hazaribag

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMinjiutgarha-Kutungia
Ordained BishopGrounds Of, Saint Xavier School, Hazaribag, Diocese of Hazaribag

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Hazaribag.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Sep 2012
  • ob: CB, 31 Oct 2012
  • c2+: CB, 9 Dec 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Number 17,612
  • ab: Bollettino, 7 Jul 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast