Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Alois Lakra

Bishop of Gumla, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jul 1955 Born
6 May 198832.8Ordained PriestPriest of Ranchi, India
28 May 199337.8IncardinatedPriest of Gumla, India
28 Jan 200650.5AppointedBishop of Gumla, India
5 Apr 200650.7Ordained BishopBishop of Gumla, India

MicroData Summary for Paul Alois Lakra
Bishop Paul Alois Lakra (born ) Bishop of Gumla

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNaditoli

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Gumla.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Jan 2006
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Number 15,133

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast