Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Benedict John Osta, S.J. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Patna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1931BornBlasurahi
9 Jun 196331.8Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
6 Mar 198048.6AppointedBishop of Patna, India
21 Jun 198048.8Ordained BishopBishop of Patna, India
16 Mar 199967.6AppointedArchbishop of Patna, India
1 Oct 200776.1RetiredArchbishop of Patna, India
30 Jan 201482.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Patna, India

MicroData Summary for Benedict John Osta:
Archbishop Benedict John Osta S.J. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Patna

  • a priest for 50.6 years
  • a bishop for 33.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 1 Oct 2007
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • d: CB, 30 Jan 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 31 Jan 2014