Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Augustine Francis Wildermuth, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Patna, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Feb 1904Born
25 Jul 193531.4Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
12 Jun 194743.3AppointedBishop of Patna, India
28 Oct 194743.6Ordained BishopBishop of Patna, India
6 Mar 198076.0RetiredBishop of Patna, India
12 Jun 199389.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Patna, India

MicroData Summary for Augustine Francis Wildermuth
Bishop Augustine Francis Wildermuth S.J. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Patna

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint Louis, MO, USA

  • a priest for 57.8 years
  • a bishop for 45.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1947, Number 114

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018