Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Étienne Sémeria, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Jaffna, Sri Lanka

Titular Bishop of Olympus (Olimpus)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Feb 1813Born
1 May 183017.2ProfessedMember of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
19 Sep 183522.6Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
6 Jun 185643.3AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Jaffna, Sri Lanka
6 Jun 185643.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Olympus (Olimpus)
17 Aug 185643.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Olympus (Olimpus)
26 Jul 185744.4SucceededVicar Apostolic of Jaffna, Sri Lanka
23 Jan 186854.9DiedVicar Apostolic of Jaffna, Sri Lanka

MicroData Summary for Jean-Étienne Sémeria
Bishop Jean-Étienne Sémeria O.M.I. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Jaffna

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Colla, Diocese of Ventimiglia, Italy, Italy
Ordained PriestNotre-Dame du Laus, Diocese of Gap, France
Ordained BishopMontolivet, Marseille, Diocese of Marseille, France
Death PlaceMarseille, Diocese of Marseille, France
Buried Place (Original)Oblate Tomb, Cemetery, Aix-en-Provence, Archdiocese of Aix (-Arles-Embrun), France

  • a priest for 32.3 years
  • a bishop for 11.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 425
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1856, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 16 Jan 2017