Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph-Eugène-Bruno Guigues, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ottawa, Ontario, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Aug 1805Born
13 May 182822.7Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
9 Jul 184741.8AppointedBishop of Bytown, Ontario, Canada
30 Jul 184842.9Ordained BishopBishop of Bytown, Ontario, Canada
8 Feb 187468.4DiedBishop of Ottawa, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Eugène-Bruno Guigues (VIAF: 21113481)
Bishop Joseph-Eugène-Bruno Guigues O.M.I. (born , died ) Bishop of Ottawa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGap, Diocese of Gap, France
Ordained BishopCathedral, Diocese of Bytown, Ontario

  • a priest for 45.7 years
  • a bishop for 25.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 431
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1848, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Feb 2017