Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph-Octave Plessis

Deceased

Archbishop of Québec


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Mar 1763BornMontréal
11 Mar 178623.0Ordained PriestPriest
26 Apr 180037.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Québec, Canada
26 Apr 180037.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Canatha
25 Jan 180137.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Canatha
17 Jan 180642.8SucceededBishop of Québec, Canada
12 Jan 181955.8AppointedArchbishop of Québec, Canada
4 Dec 182562.7DiedArchbishop of Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Octave Plessis:
Archbishop Joseph-Octave Plessis (born , died ) Archbishop of Québec

  • a priest for 39.7 years
  • a bishop for 24.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 130, and Page 316
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1801, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015