Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gabriele Papa

Deceased

Archbishop of Sorrento


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1772BornVietri
20 Dec 179422.9Ordained PriestPriest
5 Oct 181947.7SelectedBishop of Nicastro, Italy
17 Dec 181947.9ConfirmedBishop of Nicastro, Italy
19 Dec 181947.9Ordained BishopBishop of Nicastro, Italy
11 Dec 182452.9SelectedArchbishop of Sorrento, Italy
20 Dec 182452.9ConfirmedArchbishop of Sorrento, Italy
26 Apr 183765.3DiedArchbishop of Sorrento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gabriele Papa
Archbishop Gabriele Papa (born , died ) Archbishop of Sorrento

  • a priest for 42.3 years
  • a bishop for 17.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 279, and Page 354
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1819, Number 74

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 17 May 2016