Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Augustin Magloire Alexandre Blanchet

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nesqually, Washington

Titular Bishop of Ibora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Aug 1797BornSt-Pierre, Canada
3 Jun 182123.8Ordained PriestPriest of Québec, Canada
28 Jul 184648.9AppointedBishop of Walla Walla, Oregon, USA
27 Sep 184649.1Ordained BishopBishop of Walla Walla, Oregon, USA
31 May 185052.8AppointedBishop of Nesqually, Washington, USA
28 Jul 185052.9InstalledBishop of Nesqually, Washington, USA
14 Jul 1879³81.9RetiredBishop of Nesqually, Washington, USA
23 Dec 187982.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Ibora
25 Feb 188789.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Nesqually, Washington, USA

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Augustin Magloire Alexandre Blanchet:
Bishop Augustin Magloire Alexandre Blanchet (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nesqually

  • a priest for 65.7 years
  • a bishop for 40.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 318, and Page 410
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 596

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013