Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Denaut

Deceased

Bishop of Québec


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jul 1743BornMontréal
25 Jan 176723.5Ordained PriestPriest
30 Sep 179451.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Québec, Canada
30 Sep 179451.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Canatha
29 Jun 179551.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Canatha
1 Sep 179754.1SucceededBishop of Québec, Canada
17 Jan 180662.4DiedBishop of Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Pierre Denaut
Bishop Pierre Denaut (born , died ) Bishop of Québec

  • a priest for 38.9 years
  • a bishop for 10.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: LC
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1795, Number 13
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 145, and Page 350

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 18 Jun 2016