Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bernard-Claude Panet

Deceased

Archbishop of Québec


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jan 1753BornQuébec
25 Oct 177825.7Ordained PriestPriest of Québec, Canada
12 Aug 180653.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Québec, Canada
12 Aug 180653.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Saldae
19 Apr 180754.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Saldae
12 Jan 181966.0AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Québec, Canada
4 Dec 182572.9SucceededArchbishop of Québec, Canada
14 Feb 183380.0DiedArchbishop of Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Bernard-Claude Panet:
Archbishop Bernard-Claude Panet (born , died ) Archbishop of Québec

  • a priest for 54.3 years
  • a bishop for 25.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 316, and Page 329
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1807, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015