Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Norbert Provencher

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Boniface, Manitoba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Feb 1787BornNicolet
21 Dec 181124.9Ordained PriestPriest
1 Feb 182033.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Québec, Canada
1 Feb 182033.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Iuliopolis
12 May 182235.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Iuliopolis
16 Apr 184457.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of North-West (Nord-Ouest), Canada
4 Jun 184760.3AppointedBishop of Saint-Boniface, Manitoba, Canada
7 Jun 185366.3DiedBishop of Saint-Boniface, Manitoba, Canada

MicroData Summary for Joseph Norbert Provencher:
Bishop Joseph Norbert Provencher (born , died ) Bishop of Saint-Boniface

  • a priest for 41.5 years
  • a bishop for 31.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 152
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 227

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013