Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edoardo Hurmuz, C.M.V. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Siraces


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1799Born
10 Sep 184748.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Siraces
19 Sep 184748.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Siraces
26 Oct 187677.7DiedTitular Bishop of Siraces

MicroData Summary for Edoardo Hurmuz (VIAF: 76652769)
Bishop Edoardo Hurmuz C.M.V. (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Siraces

EventPlace
Birth PlaceConstaninople, Turkey
Ordained BishopSanti Giovanni e Paolo al Celio, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 29.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 522
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1847, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 19 Feb 2017