Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Carlo Gigli

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tivoli, Italy

Titular Bishop of Claudiopolis in Honoriade


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1802Born
23 Sep 182624.3Ordained PriestPriest
14 Dec 184038.6AppointedBishop of Tivoli, Italy
21 Dec 184038.6Ordained BishopBishop of Tivoli, Italy
1880¹77.6ResignedBishop of Tivoli, Italy
13 Dec 188078.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Claudiopolis in Honoriade
24 Aug 188179.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Tivoli, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Carlo Gigli (VIAF: 88866818)
Archbishop Carlo Gigli (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tivoli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAnagni
Ordained BishopSte Catherine de Sienne, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 54.9 years
  • a bishop for 40.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 209
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 370
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,840, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast