Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Trotta

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Teramo, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Gortyna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jan 1831Born
15 Oct 185423.7Ordained PriestPriest
26 Jun 187645.4AppointedBishop of Ariano, Italy
2 Jul 187645.4Ordained BishopBishop of Ariano, Italy
1 Jun 188857.3AppointedBishop of Teramo, Italy
Jan 1902³70.9RetiredBishop of Teramo, Italy
31 Jan 190271.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Gortyna
15 Aug 190675.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Teramo, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Trotta (VIAF: 89446911)
Archbishop Francesco Trotta (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Teramo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCosta Frazione, Archdiocese of Palermo
Ordained BishopS. Carlo au Corso, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 51.8 years
  • a bishop for 30.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 112, and Page 121
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 289
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1876, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Mar 2017