Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pietro Maglione

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Capaccio e Vallo della Lucania, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Theodosiopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jan 1834Born
29 May 185824.3Ordained PriestPriest
15 Jun 187440.3AppointedBishop of Cariati, Italy
18 Dec 187642.8AppointedBishop of Capaccio e Vallo della Lucania, Italy
17 Dec 190066.8ResignedBishop of Capaccio e Vallo della Lucania, Italy
17 Dec 190066.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Theodosiopolis
13 Apr 1903³69.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Capaccio e Vallo della Lucania, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Maglione
Archbishop Pietro Maglione (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Capaccio e Vallo della Lucania

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEboli

  • a priest for 44.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 180, and Page 182
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 547
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1874, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Mar 2017