Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrea d’Agostino, C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ariano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Dec 1838BornAvellino
1 Dec 186123.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
1 Jun 188849.5AppointedBishop of Ariano, Italy
11 Jun 188849.5Ordained BishopBishop of Ariano, Italy
14 Feb 191374.2DiedBishop of Ariano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Andrea d’Agostino:
Bishop Andrea d’Agostino C.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Ariano

  • a priest for 51.2 years
  • a bishop for 24.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 121
  • ob/c2: CB, 7 May 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013