Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Federico Pietro Foschi

Deceased

Archbishop of Perugia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jun 1834Born
19 Sep 185723.2Ordained PriestPriest
27 Feb 188045.6AppointedBishop of Perugia, Italy
14 Mar 188045.7Ordained BishopBishop of Perugia, Italy
27 Mar 188247.7AppointedArchbishop of Perugia, Italy
12 Nov 189561.3DiedArchbishop of Perugia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Federico Pietro Foschi (VIAF: 88890729)
Archbishop Federico Pietro Foschi (born , died ) Archbishop of Perugia

EventPlace
Birth PlacePerugia, Diocese of Perugia
Ordained BishopS. Charles au Corso, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 38.1 years
  • a bishop for 15.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 448
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1880, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jun 2017