Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicola Ranieri, O.F.M. Ref. †

Deceased

Bishop of Norcia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1843Born
22 Sep 186622.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Reformed Friars Minor
18 Mar 189551.4AppointedBishop of Norcia, Italy
31 Mar 189551.4Ordained BishopBishop of Norcia, Italy
24 Jul 190460.7DiedBishop of Norcia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Nicola Ranieri
Bishop Nicola Ranieri O.F.M. Ref. (born , died ) Bishop of Norcia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCivitella S. Maria dei Pazzi, Diocese of Todi
Ordained BishopS. Chiara, Assisi, Diocese of Assisi

  • a priest for 37.8 years
  • a bishop for 9.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,901
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 421
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1,895, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast