Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicanor Priori

Deceased

Bishop of Assisi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1839Born
19 Apr 186222.5Ordained PriestPriest
30 Dec 188950.2AppointedBishop of Assisi, Italy
6 Jan 189050.3Ordained BishopBishop of Assisi, Italy
15 Dec 189556.2DiedBishop of Assisi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Nicanor Priori
Bishop Nicanor Priori (born , died ) Bishop of Assisi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCagli, Diocese of Cagli e Pergola
Ordained BishopSt. Apollinaire, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 33.6 years
  • a bishop for 5.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 126
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1890, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jun 2017