Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacomo Traversi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Segni


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Oct 1779BornRoma
22 Sep 180424.9Ordained PriestPriest
12 Jul 184161.7AppointedBishop of Segni, Italy
1 Aug 184161.8Ordained BishopBishop of Segni, Italy
3 Jun 184565.6ResignedBishop of Segni, Italy
7 Jan 185373.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Segni, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Traversi:
Bishop Giacomo Traversi (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Segni

  • a priest for 48.3 years
  • a bishop for 11.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 346

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013