Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Niccola Crispigni (Grispigni)

Deceased

Bishop of Foligno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Nov 1798BornViterbo
16 Jun 182122.6Ordained PriestPriest
24 Jan 184243.2AppointedBishop of Poggio Mirteto, Italy
6 Feb 184243.2Ordained BishopBishop of Poggio Mirteto, Italy
27 Mar 186768.4AppointedBishop of Foligno, Italy
29 Aug 187980.8DiedBishop of Foligno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Niccola Crispigni (Grispigni):
Bishop Niccola Crispigni (Grispigni) (born , died ) Bishop of Foligno

  • a priest for 58.2 years
  • a bishop for 37.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 278
  • ob/c2+: CB, 8 Apr 2012
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 251

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013