Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carmelo Pascucci

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Perugia, Italy

Titular Bishop of Ptolemais in Phoenicia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jan 1802Born
17 Dec 182523.9Ordained PriestPriest of Perugia, Italy
27 Oct 187169.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Perugia, Italy
27 Oct 187169.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Ptolemais in Phoenicia
19 Nov 187169.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ptolemais in Phoenicia
22 Apr 187472.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Perugia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carmelo Pascucci (VIAF: 260193998)
Bishop Carmelo Pascucci (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Perugia

EventPlace
Birth PlacePerugia, Diocese of Perugia
Ordained BishopPerugia, Diocese of Perugia

  • a priest for 48.3 years
  • a bishop for 2.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Number 10,548
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 471
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1871, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 27 Feb 2017