Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emidio Foschini

Deceased

Bishop of Città della Pieve, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jan 1804Born
12 Sep 185349.6AppointedBishop of Città della Pieve, Italy
18 Sep 185349.6Ordained BishopBishop of Città della Pieve, Italy
1 Oct 188884.7DiedBishop of Città della Pieve, Italy

MicroData Summary for Emidio Foschini
Bishop Emidio Foschini (born , died ) Bishop of Città della Pieve

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMassa Lombarda
Ordained BishopS. Carlo ai Catinari, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 35.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 207
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1853, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast