Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bonifacio Cajani

Deceased

Bishop of Cagli e Pergola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1800³BornGualdo Tadino
3 Oct 182424.4Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jul 184242.2AppointedBishop of Cagli e Pergola, Italy
7 Aug 184242.2Ordained BishopBishop of Cagli e Pergola, Italy
9 Jun 186363.1DiedBishop of Cagli e Pergola, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bonifacio Cajani
Bishop Bonifacio Cajani (born , died ) Bishop of Cagli e Pergola

  • a priest for 38.6 years
  • a bishop for 20.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1861
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 127
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1842, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 25 Nov 2016