Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Crispino Agostinucci

Deceased

Bishop of Montefeltro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Oct 1797BornUrbino
23 Sep 182022.9Ordained PriestPriest
5 Nov 184952.0AppointedBishop of Montefeltro, Italy
1 Jan 185052.2Ordained BishopBishop of Montefeltro, Italy
26 Apr 185658.5DiedBishop of Montefeltro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Crispino Agostinucci:
Bishop Crispino Agostinucci (born , died ) Bishop of Montefeltro

  • a priest for 35.6 years
  • a bishop for 6.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1856
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 269

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013